+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -3
Adopted (3/6/2017 9:53:55 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/6/2017 11:52:44 AM)