+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #5319
4/9/2015 3:30:31 PM