+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 52, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Boquist, Monroe, Olsen.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-04 by unanimous consent.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-03 by unanimous consent.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 60.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 23, 2017 Calendar.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/13/2017 10:46:25 AM)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor