+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 117, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 14, 2019.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Clem, Hernandez, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Speaker Kotek, Wilson.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Heard. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Boquist, Riley, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Thatcher, Winters.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Keny-Guyer; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Smith G, Smith Warner.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing cancelled.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A3
Adopted (4/19/2019 9:49 AM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/21/2019 1:38 PM)