+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -5
Proposed (4/11/2017 11:12:35 AM)
Amendment -6
Adopted (4/11/2017 11:12:45 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/9/2017 1:30:00 PM)