+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 238, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Beyer.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Berger. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Fagan, Gelser, McKeown, Sprenger.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 5, 2013 Calendar.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.