+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #
3/5/2015 3:40:42 PM
Amendment #4256
3/5/2015 3:40:42 PM