+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 434, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 12--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Beyer, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-11 by unanimous consent.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-10 by unanimous consent.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Noble, Smith DB.
- Read. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 18--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Witt, Zika.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading. Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Work Session held.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (8)
Amendment -A12
Proposed (5/29/2019 10:50 AM)
Amendment -B14
Proposed (5/29/2019 8:26 AM)
Amendment -A13
Adopted (4/17/2019 1:36 PM)
Amendment -11
Proposed (4/4/2019 5:16 PM)
Amendment -10
Adopted (4/4/2019 5:16 PM)
Amendment -9
Proposed (3/28/2019 10:39 AM)
Amendment -8
Proposed (3/28/2019 10:40 AM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (2/19/2019 11:19 AM)