+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 1, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 589, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 23, 2019.
On July 23, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 2--Boles, Clem.
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2019 Calendar.
- Second reading.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Possible Work Session cancelled.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A4
Adopted (6/18/2019 1:07 PM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (3/11/2019 10:20 AM)