+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 117, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 01, 2021.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Boquist, Girod, Heard, Kennemer, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Anderson, Thatcher.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Prusak. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 3--Cate, Evans, Levy.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar.
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar.
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -3
Proposed (3/25/2021 10:13 AM)
Amendment -6
Adopted (3/25/2021 10:13 AM)
Amendment -A7
Proposed (5/5/2021 11:11 AM)