+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Transportation, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/27/2021 4:58 PM)