+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 19, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 16, (2019 Laws): Effective date April 2, 2019.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Girod, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Heard, Johnson, Winters.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Workforce.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 60.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/12/2019 12:00 PM)