+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 161, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bentz declared potential conflict of interest.
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-16 by unanimous consent.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Wilde. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Barreto, Leif, McLane, Witt.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (3/14/2019 2:29 PM)