+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Effectiveness.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (9)
Amendment #
3/3/2015 10:47:15 AM
Amendment #4174
3/3/2015 10:47:15 AM
Amendment #4173
3/3/2015 10:47:15 AM
Amendment #4150
2/24/2015 10:30:20 AM
Amendment #4148
2/20/2015 9:08:12 AM
Amendment #4149
2/20/2015 9:08:12 AM
Amendment #4060
2/24/2015 10:30:20 AM
Amendment #4009
2/20/2015 9:08:12 AM
Amendment #4008
2/20/2015 9:08:12 AM