+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
- Third reading. Carried by Neron. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 8--Boshart Davis, Cate, Drazan, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan; Excused, 5--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Leif, Levy, Nearman.
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing cancelled.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment -5
Proposed (3/29/2021 9:05 AM)
Amendment -7
Adopted (4/6/2021 6:22 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/19/2021 3:57 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/19/2021 3:57 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (3/26/2021 11:45 AM)
Amendment -6
Proposed (3/25/2021 10:11 AM)