+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 38, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 05, 2015.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-15 by unanimous consent.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed.Ayes, 60.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass and be placed on Consent Calendar.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor