+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Witt; Excused, 1--Barreto; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/8/2019 12:27 PM)