+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 68, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Findley, Keny-Guyer.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/18/2019 12:17 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (3/21/2019 11:35 AM)