+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Economic Development and Trade with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/14/2017 6:30:46 PM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor