+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 271, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Evans, Fahey; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Findley, Rayfield.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Land Use.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/6/2019 5:06 PM)