+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 26, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 515, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 22, 2015.
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 37; Nays, 20--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Gilliam, Hack, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 2--Esquivel, Taylor; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 22; nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Post; Excused, 1--Smith.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (7)
Amendment #7137
6/1/2015 11:16:06 AM
Amendment #7332
6/3/2015 3:17:01 PM
Amendment #7136
6/1/2015 11:16:06 AM
Amendment #7051
5/28/2015 1:43:27 PM
Amendment #7050
5/28/2015 1:43:27 PM
Amendment #5839
4/15/2015 9:05:24 AM
Amendment #5696
4/15/2015 9:05:24 AM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor