+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment 1
Proposed (3/30/2017 11:39:14 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/30/2017 11:39:14 AM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor