+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (34)
On August 14, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 734, (2013 Laws): Effective date October 7, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On July 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 34; Nays, 25--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Boone.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 16; nays, 13--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Starr.
- Motion to reconsider carried.Ayes, 16; nays, 13--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Starr.
On July 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Bill failed.Ayes, 15; nays, 15--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters.
- Johnson, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote nay.
- Johnson served notice of possible reconsideration.
On July 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill. (Printed C-Eng.)
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to refer to Rules carried on voice vote.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed.Ayes, 35; Nays, 25--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett.
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment #2965
Adopted
Amendment #2121
Not Adopted
Amendment #2157
Adopted
Amendment #2079
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor