+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On July 7, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to rerefer to Revenue carried. Rereferred.
On July 6, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to July 7, 2013 Calendar.
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to July 6, 2013 Calendar.
On July 2, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed.
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference, then be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Revenue, then Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (14)
Amendment #2290
Combined
Amendment #2250
Not Adopted
Amendment #2204
Adopted
Amendment #2203
Adopted
Amendment #2202
Adopted
Amendment #2201
Adopted
Amendment #2188
Adopted
Amendment #2200
Adopted
Amendment #2119
Not Adopted
Amendment #2117
Not Adopted
Amendment #2118
Not Adopted
Amendment #2116
Not Adopted
Amendment #698
Adopted
Amendment #776
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor