+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Student Success by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Student Success by prior reference.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Student Success.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/8/2019 8:17 AM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/28/2019 9:15 AM)