+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 73, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Baertschiger. Passed.Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Burdick, George, Johnson, Whitsett.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Harker; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Richardson.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Land Use.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #143
Adopted