+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 103, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 20, 2015.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Workforce.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Esquivel. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 14, 2015 Calendar.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #5157
4/6/2015 3:47:09 PM
Amendment #5156
4/6/2015 3:47:09 PM
+ − Sponsors (18)
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor