+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rural Communities, Land Use and Water.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #4041
2/24/2015 11:16:13 AM
Amendment #3995
2/19/2015 12:09:06 PM
Amendment #3956
2/17/2015 11:44:02 AM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor