+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 525, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 6--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to 06-24 by unanimous consent.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 59.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Tax Expenditures.
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Tax Expenditures by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Tax Expenditures.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/26/2021 10:48 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (6/11/2021 2:43 PM)
Amendment -6
Adopted (6/12/2021 9:02 PM)
Amendment -8
Proposed (6/14/2021 4:30 PM)