+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/14/2017 2:19:28 PM)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor