+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 65, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-25 by unanimous consent.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Lewis. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Greenlick, Lively, Smith Warner; Excused, 2--Findley, Keny-Guyer.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 28, 2019 Calendar.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/18/2019 11:10 AM)