+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Boshart Davis, Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 10--Bynum, Cate, Evans, Marsh, Nathanson, Nosse, Ruiz, Sanchez, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 3--Lewis, Reschke, Smith G.
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 20, 2023 Calendar.
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans.
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -5
Adopted (3/8/2023 11:10 AM)