+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 305, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2019.
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Taylor.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--McLain, McLane, Witt.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.