+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 399, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 60.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Marsh; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Speaker Kotek, Witt.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2019 Calendar.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -A4
Adopted (5/16/2019 9:30 AM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (4/8/2019 9:35 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/28/2019 12:18 PM)