+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 136, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 30.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Olson, Speaker Kotek.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 16, 2017 Calendar.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.