+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 193, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Beyer, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 5--Findley, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB; Excused, 1--Barreto; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -A5
Proposed (4/29/2019 7:28 AM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (4/1/2019 11:57 AM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (4/1/2019 12:35 PM)