+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 316, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 10, 2015.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-28 by unanimous consent.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services and Early Childhood.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed.Ayes, 60.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Judiciary.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #5007
4/1/2015 5:06:43 PM
Amendment #4319
3/9/2015 3:23:08 PM
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor