+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 135, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 30.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 19, 2017 Calendar.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2017 Calendar.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2017 Calendar.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.