+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 14, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 643, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed with line-item veto.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 2--Knopp, Thatcher; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 4--Helt, Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan.
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by McLane, Schouten.
On June 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled.
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment -A6
Adopted (6/25/2019 2:12 PM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (4/8/2019 4:29 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (4/8/2019 11:10 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/8/2019 11:10 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/2/2019 1:35 PM)