+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 128, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 21, 2015.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Nearman. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Taylor.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 5, 2015 Calendar.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 4, 2015 Calendar.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Effectiveness.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsors (2)
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor