+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 115, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 01, 2021.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Jama. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Anderson, Thatcher.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Labor and Business.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 7--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Clem, Leif, Smith G, Speaker Kotek, Wallan.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to General Government.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/16/2021 5:22 PM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/16/2021 5:22 PM)
Amendment -5
Adopted (3/15/2021 11:53 AM)