+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 38, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Olsen,Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Johnson.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.