+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 30, ( Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Monroe, Thatcher.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Alonso Leon, Boone.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/15/2017 10:08:32 AM)