+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 152, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 25, 2017.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 45; Nays, 14--Barreto, Esquivel, Huffman, Johnson, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 1--Boone.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 16--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Huffman, Johnson, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A2
Adopted (5/2/2017 10:02:37 AM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/13/2017 1:25:59 PM)