+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 13, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 417, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 22, 2017.
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 47; Nays, 10--Barreto, Esquivel, Heard, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 2--Bentz, McLane; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed. Ayes, 25; nays, 5--Girod, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Alonso Leon, Barnhart, Bynum, Fahey, Gorsek, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Piluso, Sollman.
- Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 22--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 2--Lewis, Noble.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment -A11
Adopted (5/29/2017 9:18:18 PM)
Amendment -A6
Proposed (4/26/2017 12:51:46 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (4/3/2017 8:27:36 AM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (3/27/2017 9:26:27 AM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (4/5/2017 4:00:46 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/5/2017 9:20:49 AM)