+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by prior reference.
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules by prior reference.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Rules.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -3
Adopted (5/18/2021 10:08 AM)