+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 151, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 20; nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters; excused, 1--Olsen.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 1--McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Lininger, Sollman.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2017 Calendar.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.