+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.