+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -4
Proposed (4/7/2017 1:56:29 PM)
Amendment -5
Adopted (4/14/2017 9:04:37 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/9/2017 10:00:49 AM)