+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 1, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 584, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
On July 23, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Repassed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 11--Barker, Fahey, Holvey, Meek, Nearman, Noble, Reschke, Sollman, Stark, Wallan, Zika; Excused, 1--Clem.
- House adopted Conference Committee Report.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read in Senate.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Recommendation: House concur in Senate amendments dated May 14, 2019 and bill be repassed.
- Work Session held.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senators Dembrow, Girod, Riley appointed Senate conferees.
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Representatives Reardon, Meek, Zika appointed House conferees.
- House refused to concur in Senate amendments.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Knopp, Olsen, Winters.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and General Government.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Nearman, Post, Reschke, Stark; Excused, 2--Clem, Findley.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -B5
Proposed (6/18/2019 3:59 PM)
Amendment -A4
Adopted (5/7/2019 2:52 PM)
Amendment -A3
Proposed (4/10/2019 11:13 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/25/2019 1:43 PM)